Jolly v. Allstate Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jenny Jolly
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company and Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00184
Filed: August 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Dismiss; granting #5 Motion to Substitute Party. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company added. Allstate Insurance Company terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/26/20. (jla)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2020 at 10:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due by 11/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/21/2020. (jf)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and, MOTION to Substitute Party by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended auto policy declarations) (Stovall, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 Defenses and ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Insurance Company. (Stovall, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Stovall, David)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Allstate Insurance Company, filed by Jenny Jolly. (jla)
August 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Insurance Company from County Court of Lee County, case number CV2020-000707. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1845608) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Other Papers, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 28, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jolly v. Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Jolly
Represented By: Michael Burnis McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: David E. Stovall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?