Tiggs et al v. McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dylan Irons, Nia Pickens, Kimberly Tiggs and Jackson Tiggs
Defendant: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00185
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/16/2020. (rtc)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rt)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 4/15/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/30/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/15/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/16/2021. Motions due by 5/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/15/2020. (rtc)
October 15, 2020 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 10/15/2020. (rtc)
October 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery of Core Information by R. Gregg Rogers on behalf of Dylan Irons, Nia Pickens, Jackson Tiggs, Kimberly Tiggs to McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. (Rogers, R.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. (Mozingo, James)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/2020. (rtc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL by James R. Mozingo on behalf of McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,, Filing of Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Return and Execution, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Issued, #5 Exhibit 5 - Complaint) (Mozingo, James) Modified on 9/10/2020 (jla).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2020. (rtc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against McElroy Truck Lines, Inc., filed by Kimberly Tiggs, Nia Pickens, Dylan Irons, Jackson Tiggs. (tab)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lee County, Mississippi, case number CV20-068(MM) L. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1846352) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
September 1, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiggs et al v. McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McElroy Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Mozingo
Represented By: Lydia Quarles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Irons
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nia Pickens
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tiggs
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackson Tiggs
Represented By: R. Gregg Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?