Westmoreland et al v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr. and Joyce Sims Westmoreland
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, John Doe Defendants A, B, C, D, Amanda Parish, State Farm Mutual, Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc., State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00201
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Morgan, Roechelle)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Amend/Correct COMPLAINT by David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr. (Vance, Bobby)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Substitute Party. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company added. State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company and State Farm Mutual terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 11/13/2020. (jla)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.) filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Morgan, Roechelle)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.), #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Responses due by 11/6/2020. Replies due by 11/6/2020. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 10/19/2020. (mga)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.), #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Morgan, Roechelle) Modified on 10/15/2020 (jla).
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Court docket, #2 Exhibit 2- Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3- Summons to Amanda Parish, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons to Parish Insurance and Financial Services, #5 Exhibit 5- Summons to State Farm Ins c/o W. E. Penna, #6 Exhibit 6-Summons to State Farm Ins c/o US Corporation Company, #7 Exhibit 7-Summons to State Farm Fire & Casualty Insurance c/o Commissioner of Insurance, #8 Exhibit 8-Summons to State Farm Mutual, #9 Exhibit 9-Notice from Insurance Commissioner re summons served on State Farm Mutual, #10 Exhibit 10-Notice from Insurance Commissioner re service on State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, #11 Exhibit 11-Summons served on State Farm Insurance, #12 Exhibit 12-Summons served on State Farm Mutual, #13 Exhibit 13-Summons served on Amanda Parish, #14 Exhibit 14-Summons served on Parish Insurance and Financial Services, #15 Exhibit 15-Summons served on State Farm Fire & Casualty, #16 Exhibit 16-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Norma Carr Ruff on behalf of State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual (Ruff, Norma)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Substitute Party Incorrectly Named Defendants) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Staying Discovery and Setting Deadline for Certain Defendants to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/14/20. (def)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr. (Vance, Bobby)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.), #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.) filed by David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr. (Vance, Bobby)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure by Bobby Taylor Vance on behalf of David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr to Webb Sanders Williams PLLC. (Vance, Bobby) Modified on 10/13/2020 (jla).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINDER re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.), #6 Memorandum in Support . (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.) . (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of H. R. Parish, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Amanda Parish) (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.); L.U.Civ.R. 7(b) states that an application for relief or other action by the court must be presented by a motion and separate memorandum brief. Attorney to refile Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum as a separate docket entries. (jla)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (To Dismiss Amanda Parish and Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.) by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit of Amanda Parish, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit of Hurbert Parish, #4 Exhibit D- SFFCC Corporate Info, #5 Exhibit E-SFMAIC Corporate Info, #6 Exhibit F-Cert of Good Standing of Parish Ins, #7 Exhibit G-Certified Policy) (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual. (Morgan, Roechelle)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b) states that an application for relief or other action by the court must be presented by a motion and separate memorandum brief. Attorney to refile Motion to Dismiss as a separate docket entry. (jla)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr, Joyce Sims Westmoreland. (jla)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual, State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company from Chickasaw County Circuit Court, case number H2020-061G. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1857915) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by State Farm Mutual, State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Amanda Parish Affidavit, #3 Exhibit C - Hubert Parish Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - SFFCC Corp Info, #5 Exhibit E - SFMAIC Corp Info, #6 Exhibit F - Certificate of Good Standing, #7 Exhibit G - Policy, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westmoreland et al v. State Farm Fire And Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire And Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Represented By: Norma Carr Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants A, B, C, D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Parish
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Represented By: Norma Carr Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parish Insurance Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Represented By: Norma Carr Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Roechelle R. Morgan
Represented By: Norma Carr Ruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jonathan Westmoreland, Jr.
Represented By: Bobby Taylor Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Sims Westmoreland
Represented By: Bobby Taylor Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?