Campbell v. Leggett & Platt, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Kathy Pettit Campbell
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Incorporated and Rogers Criddle
Case Number: 1:2021cv00002
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Rogers Criddle answer due 3/31/2021. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 3/3/21. (NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED) (cs) Modified on 3/4/2021 (jla).
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint - UNOPPOSED by Rogers Criddle. (Bland, Mallory) Modified on 3/2/2021 (jla).
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William T. Siler, Jr on behalf of Rogers Criddle (Siler, William)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Leggett & Platt, Incorporated answer due 3/31/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 2/23/21. (cs)
February 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William T. Siler, Jr on behalf of Leggett & Platt, Incorporated (Siler, William)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Leggett & Platt, Incorporated. (Bland, Mallory)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Reissued as to Leggett & Platt, Incorporated; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0537-1892528, filed by Kathy Pettit Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
January 8, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Leggett & Platt, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leggett & Platt, Incorporated
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Represented By: William T. Siler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Criddle
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Represented By: William T. Siler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Pettit Campbell
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?