Smart Communications Collier, Inc. v. Lowndes County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Smart Communications Collier, Inc.
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi, Lowndes County Sheriff's Office, Lowndes County Sheri Eddie Hawkins and Lowndes County Sheriff Eddie Hawkins
Case Number: 1:2021cv00078
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #12 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. Attorney will be directed to refile in the future. (jla)
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or, MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens filed by Smart Communications Collier, Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie) Modified on 6/17/2021 (jla).
June 16, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens filed by Smart Communications Collier, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Emails) (Rippee, Stephanie)
June 16, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion; All exhibits should be filed with the response to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile response and memorandum brief. (jla)
June 16, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 Response in Opposition to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or, MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens filed by Smart Communications Collier, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Emails) (Rippee, Stephanie) Modified on 6/16/2021 (jla).
June 8, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens filed by Smart Communications Collier, Inc.. (Rippee, Stephanie)
May 25, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens filed by Lowndes County Sheriff Eddie Hawkins, Lowndes County Sheriff's Office, Lowndes County, Mississippi. (Smith, Courtney)
May 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss To Transfer and/or, MOTION to Remand to State Court or in the Alternative for Forum Non-Conviens by Lowndes County Sheriff Eddie Hawkins, Lowndes County Sheriff's Office, Lowndes County, Mississippi. (Smith, Courtney)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie McGee Rippee on behalf of Smart Communications Collier, Inc. Lowndes County Sheriff's Office served on 5/7/2021. (Rippee, Stephanie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie McGee Rippee on behalf of Smart Communications Collier, Inc. Lowndes County Sheriff Eddie Hawkins served on 5/7/2021. (Rippee, Stephanie)
May 11, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie McGee Rippee on behalf of Smart Communications Collier, Inc. Lowndes County, Mississippi served on 5/6/2021. (Rippee, Stephanie) Modified on 5/11/2021 (jla).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 5/3/21. (jla)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eddie Hawkins, Lowndes County Sheriff's Office, Lowndes County, Mississippi; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1942482, filed by Smart Communications Collier, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Smart Communications - Lowndes County, MS Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Smart Communications - Lowndes County, MS Contract Addendum, #3 Exhibit C - Lowndes Notice Letter, #4 Exhibit E - 4/23/21 Smart Communications Mail - Lowndes Co Sheriff's Office, #5 Exhibit E - 4/27/21 Smart Communications Mail - Lowndes Co Sheriff's Office, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
May 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Communications Collier, Inc. v. Lowndes County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County, Mississippi
Represented By: Courtney Bradford Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Courtney Bradford Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County Sheri Eddie Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowndes County Sheriff Eddie Hawkins
Represented By: Courtney Bradford Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Communications Collier, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie McGee Rippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?