Turner v. AmTrust North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alice Turner
Defendant: Republic Diversified Services, Inc. doing business as Republic Underwriter Insurance Company, AmTrust North America, Inc. and John Does #1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00092
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Andrew Charles Burrell re Registration for Electronic Filing.. Signed by Clerk on 7/21/21. (jla)
July 14, 2021 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Clerk, #2 Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment, #5 Complaint & Jury Demand, #6 Plaintiff Atty Letter to Clerk filing Complaint & Jury Demand, #7 Fee Bill of State Court, #8 Summons to Amtrust North America, #9 Summons to Republic Diversified Services, #10 Plaintiff Atty letter to Clerk filing Proofs of Service, #11 Proof of Service on Amtrust, #12 Affidavit of Service on Republic) (Cicero, Charles)
July 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Shane C. Whitfield re Registration for Electronic Filing. Signed by Clerk on 7/2/21. (jla)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Change Venue to Southern District of Mississippi, Gulfport Division by AmTrust North America, Inc., Republic Diversified Services, Inc.. (Cicero, Charles)
June 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Mandatory Electronic Filing as to Andrew Charles Burrell, Shane C Whitfield. Mailed to attorneys at address listed. (tab)
June 2, 2021 Filing 5 LIST OF ATTORNEYS and parties in state court action by Charles Kenneth Cicero, III on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., Republic Diversified Services, Inc. (tab)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF FILING of state court record by Charles Kenneth Cicero, III on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., Republic Diversified Services, Inc. (tab)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE with requirement to give notice of removal by Charles Kenneth Cicero, III on behalf of AmTrust North America, Inc., Republic Diversified Services, Inc. (tab)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against AmTrust North America, Inc., John Does #1-5, Republic Diversified Services, Inc., filed by Alice Turner. (tab)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Republic Diversified Services, Inc., AmTrust North America, Inc. from Circuit Court of Lowndes County, Mississippi, case number 2021-0033-CV1K. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1954466) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Republic Diversified Services, Inc., AmTrust North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 E-mail confirming refusal to stipulate below 75k, #3 Exhibit 3 State Court Record with Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)
June 2, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. AmTrust North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Turner
Represented By: Andrew Charles Burrell
Represented By: Shane C. Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Diversified Services, Inc. doing business as Republic Underwriter Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Cicero, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust North America, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Kenneth Cicero, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?