Colony Insurance Company v. Beasley et al
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Defendant: Darren Beasley, Busy Beaver Tree Removal, Paul Rast, April Rast and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2021cv00120
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against April Rast, Busy Beaver Tree Removal, Colony Insurance Company, Paul Rast, Darren Beasley, COUNTERCLAIM against April Rast, Busy Beaver Tree Removal, Colony Insurance Company, Paul Rast, Darren Beasley by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Policy) (Heidelberg, Cecil)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/10/2021. (rtc)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Darren Beasley answer due 10/4/2021. Granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Progressive Gulf Insurance Company answer due 9/21/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/9/2021. (yf)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Heidelberg, Cecil)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Darren Beasley. (Goodwin, Gary) Modified on 9/3/2021 (jla).
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gary Street Goodwin on behalf of Darren Beasley (Goodwin, Gary) Modified on 9/3/2021 (jla).
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Darren Beasley, Busy Beaver Tree Removal, Paul Rast, April Rast, and Progressive Gulf Insurance Company (jla)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Darren Beasley, Busy Beaver Tree Removal, Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, April Rast, Paul Rast; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1976740, filed by Colony Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
July 27, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colony Insurance Company v. Beasley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew Taylor Biggers
Represented By: Olivia Yen Truong
Represented By: Richard Edward King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren Beasley
Represented By: Gary Street Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Busy Beaver Tree Removal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Rast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Rast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: Cecil Maison Heidelberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John and Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?