The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Jeffrey Johnson, Christopher Johnson, Mitchell Johnson and Martha Ann Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00123
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Reissued as to Martha Ann Johnson; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America Mitchell Johnson served on 8/12/2021. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
September 7, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Martha Ann Johnson (jla)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2021. (rtc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Christopher Johnson, Jeffrey Johnson, Mitchell Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Order for Appointment of Administrator, Issuance of Letters of Administration, Determination of Heirs and Approval of the Sale of Real Property and Final Judgment under Mississippi Rules of Civil Procedure 54(b) as to Respondent, Martha Ann Johnson, #2 Exhibit "B" - Antenuptial Agreement) (Chapman, Michael)
September 1, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 Answer to Complaint; Attorney to refile as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) which states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. (jla)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America Jeffrey Johnson served on 8/13/2021. (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
August 30, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Rule 12 Defenses and Affirmative Defenses by Christopher Johnson, Jeffrey Johnson, Mitchell Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B") (Chapman, Michael)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Quinlivan, Lawrence)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Christopher Johnson, Jeffrey Johnson, Martha Ann Johnson, Mitchell Johnson; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1979978, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Insured's Death Cert., #3 Exhibit R. Johnson's Death Cert., #4 Exhibit D - Antenuptial Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Court Order, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Lawrence Matthew Quinlivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Johnson
Represented By: Michael Spencer Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Johnson
Represented By: Michael Spencer Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Johnson
Represented By: Michael Spencer Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Ann Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?