Morris v. Shelter Insurance Companies et al
Plaintiff: Brad Morris
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies, Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC, Rene Lewis, Jared Lee and Unknown Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00132
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC. (Mitchell, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC. (Mitchell, Michael)
October 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Brady Mitchell, II on behalf of Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC (Mitchell, Michael)
October 18, 2021 Filing 17 JOINDER re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court; #9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT by Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC. (Carroll, Mark) Modified on 10/19/2021 (jla).
October 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #16 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
October 15, 2021 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 Response in Opposition to Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shelter Insurance Companies. (Best, Brad) Modified on 10/18/2021 (jla).
October 15, 2021 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shelter Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2021 LLC Annual Report, #3 Exhibit Unit 12 Declarations, #4 Exhibit UM Rejections, #5 Exhibit Unit 13 Declarations, #6 Exhibit Shelter Proof of Payment, #7 Exhibit Renewal Notice, #8 Exhibit Receipt, #9 Exhibit Three Month Renewal of Unit 12) (Best, Brad)
October 15, 2021 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Rene Lewis and Jared Lee (jla)
October 12, 2021 Filing 13 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Issued Summons, #3 Exhibit State Court Notice of Notice of Removal) (Best, Brad)
October 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #11 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court Responses due by 10/15/2021. No further written order will issue from the court. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 10/7/2021. No document attached. (llw)
October 7, 2021 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Best, Brad)
October 6, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
September 30, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Unopposed) by Shelter Insurance Companies. (McNees, Edward)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brad Morris. (Boutwell, Marc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brad Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Brad Morris, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Sharon Morris) (Boutwell, Marc)
September 20, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Attorney to refile motion and exhibits as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) which states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. (cb)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brad Morris. (Boutwell, Marc)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Brad Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B") (Boutwell, Marc)
September 14, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC. (Carroll, Mark)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Shelter Insurance. (McNees, Edward)
September 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Shelter Insurance Companies. (Best, Brad)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brad Morris. (jla)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelter Insurance Companies from County Court of Lee County, case number CV2021-000629. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1990698) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Shelter Insurance Companies. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Shelter Insurance Companies et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brad Morris
Represented By: Marc L. Boutwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Insurance Companies
Represented By: Brad Best
Represented By: Edward R. McNees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bishop Agency, LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Carroll
Represented By: Michael Brady Mitchell, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?