Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC v. City of Starkville, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC
Defendant: City of Starkville, Mississippi and Lynn Spruill
Case Number: 1:2021cv00135
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/23/2021. (tjw)
September 20, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Latimer, Christopher)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/20/21. (bnd)
September 20, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint; Document to be refiled using the login credentials of signing attorney. (jla)
September 17, 2021 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Burch, Amanda)
September 15, 2021 Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) DECLARATION of Chaim Puretz in Support of Motion. (Kahane, S.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 29 AFFIDAVIT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) DECLARATION of Mary Williams in Support of Motion. (Kahane, S.)
September 14, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) Third Supplemental filed by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Lyle MeCaskey, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Lynn Spruill) (Latimer, Christopher)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/9/2021. (sko)
September 9, 2021 Filing 26 EXHIBITS - HEARING on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit 1, #2 Defendant's Exhibit 2, #3 Defendant's Exhibit 3) (tjw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 25 Exhibit List. (tjw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Sharion Aycock: Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief held on 9/9/2021 -- Exhibits Admitted. (Court Reporter Rita Davis.) (tjw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 23 EXHIBIT re #22 Notice (Other) of Filing Certificate of Reinstatement re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1). (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/9/2021 (jla).
September 9, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE by S. Joshua Kahane on behalf of Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC re #21 Response in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Filing Certificate of Reinstatement of Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/9/2021 (jla).
September 9, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #22 Notice (Other), #23 Exhibits to Other Document; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion ( #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification). Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
September 7, 2021 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) filed by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summary of Standing with MS Secretary of State, #2 Exhibit List of Documents Filed with MS Secretary of State) (Burch, Amanda) Modified on 9/8/2021 (jla).
September 7, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 Response in Opposition to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) filed by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Burch, Amanda) Modified on 9/8/2021 (jla).
September 7, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #19 Reply to Response to Motion; L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2) and Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) states that all supporting exhibits must be denominated by both an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Court staff has made the correction. Attorney will directed to refile in the future. (jla)
September 5, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) filed by Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Repoert, #2 Exhibit B - Order and Final Judgment) (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/7/2021 (jla).
September 1, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1): Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/1/2021. (tjw)
September 1, 2021 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Sharion Aycock: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/1/2021. (Court Reporter Phyllis McLarty.) (tjw)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/14/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/1/2021. (rtc)
September 1, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE by S. Joshua Kahane on behalf of Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Report) (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
September 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda L. Burch on behalf of City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill (Burch, Amanda)
September 1, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher James Latimer on behalf of City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill (Latimer, Christopher)
August 31, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/1/2021 11:00 AM in Amory Tele-Conference before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (sko)
August 31, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) . (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
August 31, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Emergency Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) . (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1)) by Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" - Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1), #2 Exhibit A to Certification) (Kahane, S.) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
August 31, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) Supplemental Response filed by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Latimer, Christopher) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
August 31, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) filed by City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit C - Email of July 6 2021, #4 Exhibit D - Email of July 29 2021, #5 Exhibit E - Order Setting Hearing, #6 Exhibit F - Brief in Support of Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss, #7 Exhibit G - Hearing Transcript, #8 Exhibit H - Order and Final Judgment) (Latimer, Christopher) Modified on 9/1/2021 (jla).
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) by Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Certification) (Kahane, S.)
August 31, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Attorney to refile memorandum brief as a separate docket entry from motion as required by L.U.Civ.R.7(b)(2) re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order in Support of Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Memorandum of Law and Certification Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 65(b)(1) (tab)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/30/2021. (sko)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC. (Kahane, S.)
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Starkville, Mississippi, Lynn Spruill; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BMSNDC-1992223, filed by Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 30, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC v. City of Starkville, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookville Schoolhouse Road Estates, LLC
Represented By: S. Joshua Kahane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Starkville, Mississippi
Represented By: Christopher James Latimer
Represented By: Amanda L. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Spruill
Represented By: Christopher James Latimer
Represented By: Amanda L. Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?