Smith v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Bobby H. Smith
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00147
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Aberdeen Division Office
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bankers Life and Casualty Company. (Saltaformaggio, Erin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Bobby H. Smith. Bankers Life and Casualty Company served on 10/13/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard) Modified on 10/28/2021 (jwr).
October 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Bobby H. Smith Bankers Life and Casualty Company served on 10/13/2021. (McLaughlin, Richard)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 9/29/2021. (jla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bankers Life and Casualty Company; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2006491, filed by Bobby H. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
September 29, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby H. Smith
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Life and Casualty Company
Represented By: Erin Diane Saltaformaggio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?