Davis v. Ogle et al
Plaintiff: Margaret Davis
Defendant: Carl Ogle and Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 1:2021cv00184
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures Submitted by Defendant Carl Ogle by H. Richmond Culp, III on behalf of Carl Ogle to Plaintiff. (Culp, H.)
January 28, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosure Information by Derek Oliver Fairchilds on behalf of Margaret Davis. (Fairchilds, Derek)
January 27, 2022 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. (Fairchilds, Derek)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2022 at 9:00 AM from Amory Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Proposed Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memos due no later than 2/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 1/7/2022. (jf)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Derek Oliver Fairchilds on behalf of Margaret Davis Carl Ogle served on 11/20/2021. (Fairchilds, Derek)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Carl Ogle. (Culp, H.)
December 9, 2021 Filing 6 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Atkins, Jay)
December 8, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois; filed in state court. (jla)
December 8, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit First Interrogatories and RFP Propounded to Carl Ogle, #4 Exhibit First Interrogatories and RFP Propounded to Safeco, #5 Exhibit Summons Issued to Carl Ogle, #6 Exhibit Summons Issued to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, #7 Exhibit Correspondence from Commissioner of Insurance, #8 Exhibit Answer of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, #9 Exhibit Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service, #10 Exhibit Consent Order Granting Motion to Extend Time Limit for Service, #11 Exhibit Notice of Removal to United States District Court, Northern District of MS, #12 Exhibit Consent to Removal) (Culp, H.)
December 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Joinder; Document to be refiled using the login credentials of signing attorney. (jla)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Culp, H.)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Carl Ogle, Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, filed by Margaret Davis. (jla)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carl Ogle from Alcorn County Circuit Court, case number 21-CV-210MMA. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2034891) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Carl Ogle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
December 7, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Ogle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Davis
Represented By: Derek Oliver Fairchilds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Ogle
Represented By: H. Richmond Culp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: H. Richmond Culp, III
Represented By: Camp Pittman
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?