Tiggs v. Safeway Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tiggs
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Company and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 1:2022cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AGREED ORDER of Dismissal; granting #9 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/3/22. (jla)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Safeway Insurance Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 1/28/22. (jla)
January 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) by James Roger Franks, Jr on behalf of Kimberly Tiggs to Lawrence Tucker, Jr.. (Franks, James)
January 18, 2022 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Issued Summons, #3 Exhibit B - Served Summons, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Removal) (Tucker, Lawrence)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/8/2022 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/10/2022. (rtc)
January 6, 2022 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Safeway Insurance Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
January 6, 2022 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Safeway Insurance Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
January 5, 2022 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kimberly Tiggs. (jwr)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Safeway Insurance Company from County Court of Lee County, Mississippi, case number CV2021-000917. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2044288) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Safeway Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 5, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiggs v. Safeway Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Tiggs
Represented By: James Roger Franks, Jr.
Represented By: William Rufus Wheeler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence John Tucker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?