Owens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Scotty Owens
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2024cv00067
Filed: April 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stuart Davis on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Davis, Stuart)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/5/2024. (jwr)
April 5, 2024 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (lgm)
April 4, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Scotty Owens. (lgm)
April 4, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Scotty Owens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lgm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scotty Owens
Represented By: Michael Burnis McHenry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: USA
Represented By: Stuart Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?