Cowan et al v. Bolivar County Board of Education
Plaintiff: Diane Cowan, Floyd Cowan, Jr., Lenden Sanders, Mack Sanders, Crystal Williams, Amelia Wesley, Dashanda Frazier, Anginette Terrell Payne, Antonio Lewis and Brenda Lewis
Defendant: Bolivar County Board of Education
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:1965cv00031
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Bolivar
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER GRANTING 286 Joint Motion for Modification as supplemented by Thigpen's affidavits; 215 Order is MODIFIED; 233 will be vacated and modified by separate Order; 252 , 264 plans are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/13/17. (tab)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER that upon dismissal of pending appeal, the Court, in deference to the District's familiarity with its schools and in recognition of the parties' joint agreement, will modify its May 13, 2016 order as requested in the joint motion re 286 Joint MOTION for Modification of Court's Order filed by United States of America. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/6/17. (tab)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER denying 223 Motion to Stay; deferring ruling on 227 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/29/16. (jtm)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/22/16. (jtm)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER denying 221 Motion to Modify Desegregation Plan; denying in part and deferring in part 223 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 8/16/16. (jtm)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 215 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 5/13/16. (bds)
July 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 100 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 7/21/14. (jtm)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 77 Order. Signed by Glen H. Davidson on 1/24/13. (jtm)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 42 Order on Motion to Substitute Party, Motion for Further Relief. Signed by Glen H. Davidson on 3/28/12. (tab)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowan et al v. Bolivar County Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Cowan
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Cowan, Jr.
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenden Sanders
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mack Sanders
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Williams
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Wesley
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dashanda Frazier
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anginette Terrell Payne
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Lewis
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Lewis
Represented By: Ellis Turnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bolivar County Board of Education
Represented By: Holmes S. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Fischbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?