McNeal v. Tate County School District
Plaintiff: Undra Todd, Linderia Todd, Rosaland Milam, Gwendolyn Bonne, Ciera Jackson, Georgia Carr, Angela Johnson and Carolyn Daniels
Defendant: Tate County School District
Case Number: 2:1970cv00029
Filed: April 27, 1970
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
County: Tate
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER finding as moot 125 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 128 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 123 MOTION /PETITION FOR CLOSURE OF COLDWATER HIGH SCHOOL ; finding as moot 130 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 123 MOTION /PETITION FOR CLOSURE OF COLDWATER HIGH SCHOOL ; finding as moot 132 Motion to Expedite; granting in part and denying in part 140 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 123 MOTION /PETITION FOR CLOSURE OF COLDWATER HIGH SCHOOL Replies due by 6/20/2022.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/13/22. (jla)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 102 Motion for Permission to file out of time Motion for Attorney's fees. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/19/17. (jtm)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion for Supplemental Relief Pursuant to Desegregation Order; granting 57 Motion for further relief Pursuant to Desegregation Order ; denying 89 Motion to Strike ; dismissing without prejudice 12 Motion to Modify attendance zones. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/7/16. (tab)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion ; denying 43 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/10/16. (bds)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 37 MOTION for Miscellaneous relief and Discovery; and ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2016.. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/28/16. (jtm)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as moot 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Expedite; granting 20 Motion to Substitute Party. Undra Todd, Linderia Todd, Rosaland Milam, Gwendolyn Bonne, Ciera Jackson, Georgia Carr, Angela Johnson and Carolyn Daniels added. Kelly McNeal (et al) terminated. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/14/16. (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeal v. Tate County School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate County School District
Represented By: Leon E. Hannaford, Jr.
Represented By: Jamie Ferguson Jacks
Represented By: John Thomas Lamar, III
Represented By: John Thomas Lamar, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Undra Todd
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linderia Todd
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaland Milam
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwendolyn Bonne
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciera Jackson
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Carr
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Johnson
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Daniels
Represented By: Solomon C. Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?