Hampton v. Tunica County Board of Supervisors et al
Case Number: 2:2006cv00100
Filed: June 13, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Vacate ; granting 48 Motion to Strike ; granting 52 Motion for Extension of Time; denying 57 Motion for Default Judgment; granting 59 Motion to Set Aside Default; granting 60 Motion to Strike ; denying 61 Motion to Strike. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 4/24/2009. (khj, USDC)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 49 Order Declining to Abstain. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 3/31/09. (cwb, USDC)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 33 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 09/29/08. (cm, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Tunica County Board of Supervisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?