Cole's Tool Works v. American Power Conversion Corporation
Case Number: 2:2006cv00169
Filed: October 10, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Delta Division Office
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: W. Allen Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 164 MOTION in Limine filed by American Power Conversion Corporation. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 3/10/2010. (pbs, USDC)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting Motion for Continuance of Trial Setting (docketed as Motion for New Trial). Trial in this matter continued from October 26, 2009 to April 5, 2010. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 7/27/2009. (pbs, USDC)
May 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying 117 Motion to Strike. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 5/07/2009. (pbs, USDC)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER denying 115 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 3/31/2009. (pbs, USDC)
November 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting 113 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 132 Motion for Leave to Amend Pleadings. Signed by W. Allen Pepper on 11/06/2008. (pbs, USDC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole's Tool Works v. American Power Conversion Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?