Michael et al v. Boutwell et al
Plaintiff: Scott Michael and Rooster's Blues House, LLC
Defendant: Clinton L. Boutwell and The Char Grille Seafood & Steaks LLC
Case Number: 3:2014cv00116
Filed: May 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 12/21/15. (jtm)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/8/15. (jtm)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 72 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/7/15. (bds)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Motion for Sanctions; denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 2/19/15. (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michael et al v. Boutwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Michael
Represented By: Luther C. Fisher, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rooster's Blues House, LLC
Represented By: Luther C. Fisher, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clinton L. Boutwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Char Grille Seafood & Steaks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?