Howell v. Fisher et al
Defendant: Marshall Fisher and Jim Hood
Petitioner: Marlon Howell
Case Number: 3:2015cv00105
Filed: June 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Debra M. Brown
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 81 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 3/21/18. (tab)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; denying 38 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 4/20/16. (jtm)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 32 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/27/16. (jtm)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 31 Motion to Revisit Funding and Supplement Petition. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 1/25/16. (jtm)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part 20 Motion for Funding; denying 21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/12/15. (jtm)
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Services of Associated Attorney. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 10/5/15. (jtm)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/11/15. (jtm)
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Funding. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 9/8/15. (jtm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Fisher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlon Howell
Represented By: William Tucker Carrington(Designation CJA Appointment)
Represented By: Sarah L. Ottinger(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?