Berkley v. Midfirst Bank et al

Plaintiff: Bertha Berkley
Defendant: Midfirst Bank and Wilson & Massey LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00110
Filed: July 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 34 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/3/2017. (dbm)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 32 Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 5/18/2016. (psk)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting 11 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/17/2015. (psk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley v. Midfirst Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Berkley
Represented By: Drayton Durell Berkley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midfirst Bank
Represented By: Kathleen Shields O'Beirne
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Massey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?