West et al v. City of Holly Springs, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Bobby West, Coya Jackson, Dianechia Patterson, Michael Perkins, Falando Marion, Janet F. Power and Daniel Green
Defendant: City of Holly Springs, Mississippi, Kelvin O. Buck and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 3:2016cv00079
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: S. Allan Alexander
Presiding Judge: Michael P. Mills
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER regarding punitive damages. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 06/12/2019. (rmw)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER setting forth parties' agreement regarding correct parties to this action. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 06/11/2019. (rmw)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER regarding protected activity issue. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 06/10/2019. (rmw)
June 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER directing the parties to file amended pleadings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 06/09/2019. (rmw)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying 162 Motion in Limine; denying 164 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/6/2019. (lpm)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 5/28/2019. (lpm)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; granting 110 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 116 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 118 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 05/03/2019. (rmw)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Amend and Supplement Pleadings; denying 42 Motion to Dismiss and/or alternatively Deny Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend and Supplement Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/1/17. (cs)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge S. Allan Alexander on 05/25/16. (sd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West et al v. City of Holly Springs, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby West
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coya Jackson
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianechia Patterson
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Perkins
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falando Marion
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet F. Power
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Green
Represented By: Gregory C. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Holly Springs, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelvin O. Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?