Gorman v. State of Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Summer Gorman
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Mississippi Gaming Commission, Tunica County, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Robert Sharp and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2016cv00204
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: Tunica
Presiding Judge: Glen H. Davidson
Presiding Judge: Jane M. Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 05/06/2019. (jwr)
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 49 Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 09/21/2018. (mga)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/25/17. (ncb)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 31 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 7/11/17. (jtm)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 21 Order on Motion for Discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 2/6/17. (jtm)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CERTAIN PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/8/16. (ncb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gorman v. State of Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Gorman
Represented By: Christi Rena McCoy
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Represented By: Krissy Casey Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Gaming Commission
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Represented By: Krissy Casey Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunica County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Represented By: Krissy Casey Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sharp
Represented By: Douglas T. Miracle
Represented By: Krissy Casey Nobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?