Lewis et al v. Loftin et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Lewis, Judith Lewis and Jerry Lee Lewis, III
Defendant: Howard Ezekiel Loftin, Phoebe Lewis-Loftin, Myra Williams, Pont Neuf, Inc. and Does 1-8
Counter_claimant: Ezekiel Asa Loftin, XII, Phoebe Lewis-Loftin and Myra Williams
Counter_defendant: Jerry Lee Lewis, III, Judith Lewis, Lori Lee Lewis Lancaster and Joseph D. Barton
Case Number: 3:2017cv00180
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Neal B. Biggers
Presiding Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 342 MEMORANDUM OPINION re 341 Order on Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 04/25/2019. (bds)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 178 Motion for Rule 35 Exam. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/25/18. (bnd)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 137 Motion to Defer Consideration. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 05/21/2018. (bds)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/3/17. (cs)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 3 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/25/17. (bnd)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Loftin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Lewis
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Lewis
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Lewis, III
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Ezekiel Loftin
Represented By: Jessie Wayne Doss
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoebe Lewis-Loftin
Represented By: Jessie Wayne Doss
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myra Williams
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pont Neuf, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Ezekiel Asa Loftin, XII
Represented By: Jessie Wayne Doss
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Phoebe Lewis-Loftin
Represented By: Jessie Wayne Doss
Represented By: Paul V. Ott
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Myra Williams
Represented By: Dan W. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Jerry Lee Lewis, III
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Judith Lewis
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Represented By: Debra Pace Branan
Represented By: Joseph David Neyman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Lori Lee Lewis Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Joseph D. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?