Jackson v. GGNSC Southaven LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lorrie Jackson
Defendant: GGNSC Southaven LLC and Diversicare of Southaven, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00185
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
0 Judge: Sharion Aycock
1 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Consolidated Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Plaintiff by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Diversicare of Southaven, LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC. (Dillard, Lamar) Modified on 10/24/2018 (jla).
October 22, 2018 Filing 18 EXHIBIT Certificate of Service to Doc #9 . (Goodman, David) Modified on 10/23/2018 (jla).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/22/18. (rtc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial - set for 1/6/2020 - 09:40 AM - in Aberdeen Bankruptcy Courthouse - Courtroom 2 - before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (mrt)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER scheduling settlement conference for June 25, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/19/18. (rtc)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 8/16/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/19/2018. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 5/16/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 6/17/2019. Motions due by 9/6/2019. Settlement Conference set for 6/25/2019 01:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/19/18. (rtc)
October 19, 2018 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 10/19/2018. (rtc)
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Lamar Bradley Dillard on behalf of Diversicare of Southaven, LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
October 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R. McCarroll, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs (McCarroll, John)
October 18, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 Notice of Service; Please file Certificate of Service (jla)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosure Information by David E. Goodman on behalf of Lorrie Jackson to Brad Dillard, Esq.. (Goodman, David) Modified on 10/18/2018 (jla).
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE STATEMENT of GGNSC Southaven, LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Diversicare of Southaven, LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 11, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Diversicare of Southaven, LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by GGNSC Southaven LLC. (Dillard, Lamar)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2018 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/31/18. (rtc)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of circuit clerk, #2 Exhibit Docket, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Summons) (Dillard, Lamar)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Diversicare of Southaven, LLC, GGNSC Southaven LLC, filed by Lorrie Jackson. (jla)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GGNSC Southaven LLC, Diversicare of Southaven, LLC from Desoto County Circuit Court, case number CI2018-154GCD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1590131) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by GGNSC Southaven LLC, Diversicare of Southaven, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Holly Rasmussen-Jones, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Robert Rice, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. GGNSC Southaven LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGNSC Southaven LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversicare of Southaven, LLC
Represented By: Lamar Bradley Dillard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorrie Jackson
Represented By: David E. Goodman
Represented By: John R. McCarroll, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?