Cooper v. Majestic Mississippi, LLC
Plaintiff: Duane Cooper
Defendant: Majestic Mississippi, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00260
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/21/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 1/22/19. (irw)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Majestic Mississippi, LLC. (Underwood, Richard)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Majestic Mississippi, LLC answer due 1/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/27/18. (ncb)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Majestic Mississippi, LLC. (Underwood, Richard)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by George Hite McLean, III on behalf of Duane Cooper Majestic Mississippi, LLC served on 12/10/2018. (McLean, George)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard D. Underwood on behalf of Majestic Mississippi, LLC (Underwood, Richard)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Majestic Mississippi, LLC.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1622141, filed by Duane Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge, #2 Exhibit B - Dismissal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Majestic Mississippi, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Majestic Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Richard D. Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Cooper
Represented By: Andre Bernard Mathis
Represented By: George Hite McLean, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?