Piatt v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carlee Ryan Piatt
Defendant: Dakota L. Byrd and Dollar General Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv00275
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Dollar General Corporation waiver sent on 1/30/2019. (Neilson, Philip) Modified on 2/5/2019 (tab).
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dollar General Corp on 01/28/2019 by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Carlee Ryan Piatt. Waiver of Service due by 2/27/2019. (Neilson, Philip)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Carlee Ryan Piatt Dakota L. Byrd served on 2/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Neilson, Philip)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dakota L. Byrd. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 22, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Dollar General Corporation and Dakota L. Byrd (jla)
December 20, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1627646, filed by Carlee Ryan Piatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piatt v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlee Ryan Piatt
Represented By: Tommy Wayne Defer
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dakota L. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?