Coburn v. Mize

Appellant: Matthew Coburn
Appellee: Jerry Paul Mize
Case Number: 3:2019cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellant's Brief by Matthew Coburn. (Rozier, David)
January 28, 2019 Remark: Trial exhibits received and on file in Oxford clerk's office (jtm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record for Appellee by U. S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Howell, Amanda)
January 18, 2019 Filing 4 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record by U. S. Bankruptcy Court. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Howell, Amanda)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills (jla)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 12/7/18. (Howell, Amanda)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jason D. Woodard on 12/7/18. (Howell, Amanda)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 16-01079-JDW. File received, filed by Matthew Coburn. Appellant Brief due by 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Docket Sheet - page 7 of the docket sheet was blank and did not scan) (Howell, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coburn v. Mize
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Matthew Coburn
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Jerry Paul Mize
Represented By: Brad Best
Represented By: Bradley Truett Golmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?