Rhea v. Career General Agency, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: James Rhea
Defendant: Dennis Basden, Guideone America Insurance Company and Career General Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00002
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/30/2019. (lpm)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Union County Circuit Court . (Thomas, Philip)
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Union County Circuit Court filed by Dennis Basden, Career General Agency, Inc., Guideone America Insurance Company. (Thomas, Philip)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference re #11 Order Staying Case (rtc)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #9 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/18/19. (cs)
January 17, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Union County Circuit Court . (Rutledge, William)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Union County Circuit Court by James Rhea. (Rutledge, William)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay by James Rhea. (Rutledge, William)
January 10, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dennis Basden, Career General Agency, Inc., Guideone America Insurance Company. (Thomas, Philip)
January 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Dennis Basden, Career General Agency, Inc., Guideone America Insurance Company. (Thomas, Philip)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/19/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/7/19. (rtc)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Thomas, Philip)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Thomas, Philip)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Dennis Basden, Career General Agency, Inc., Guideone America Insurance Company, filed by James Rhea. (tab)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Career General Agency, Inc., Dennis Basden, Guideone America Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Union County, Mississippi, case number CV2018-272. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1630564) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Career General Agency, Inc., Dennis Basden, Guideone America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhea v. Career General Agency, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Rhea
Represented By: William O. Rutledge, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Basden
Represented By: Philip Williams Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guideone America Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip Williams Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Career General Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Philip Williams Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?