Wittner v. Schwartz et al

Plaintiff: Kathryn P. Wittner
Defendant: John Does 1-8, Simon Schwartz, Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased and Ruth P. Schwartz
Case Number: 3:2019cv00003
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/19/2019. (irw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased, Ruth P. Schwartz, Simon Schwartz. (Byars, Wilton)
February 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Julia Bryant Jimenez on behalf of Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased, Ruth P. Schwartz, Simon Schwartz (Jimenez, Julia)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased answer due 2/18/2019; Ruth P. Schwartz answer due 2/18/2019; Simon Schwartz answer due 2/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 2/1/19. (bfg)
January 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased, Ruth P. Schwartz, Simon Schwartz. (Byars, Wilton) Modified on 2/1/2019 (jla).
January 24, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen W. Dummer on behalf of Kathryn P. Wittner Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased served on 1/15/2019. (Dummer, Stephen)
January 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen W. Dummer on behalf of Kathryn P. Wittner Simon Schwartz served on 1/12/2019. (Dummer, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2019 (tab).
January 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephen W. Dummer on behalf of Kathryn P. Wittner Ruth P. Schwartz served on 1/12/2019. (Dummer, Stephen) Modified on 1/24/2019 (tab).
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael S. Carr on behalf of Kathryn P. Wittner (Carr, Michael)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
January 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased, Ruth P. Schwartz, Simon Schwartz. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1630328, filed by Kathryn P. Wittner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Will of Thelma R. Pailet, #2 Exhibit B-Last Will & Testament of Thelma R. Pailet, #3 Exhibit C-Spoilation Letter, #4 Exhibit D-Letter from Memphis Neurology, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wittner v. Schwartz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Schwartz
Represented By: Julia Bryant Jimenez
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Thelma R. Pailet, Deceased
Represented By: Julia Bryant Jimenez
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth P. Schwartz
Represented By: Julia Bryant Jimenez
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn P. Wittner
Represented By: Stephen W. Dummer
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?