Tarver v. Mims et al
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Tarver
Defendant: Ricky Knight, John Does 1-10, Robert J. Mims and S. David Norquist
Case Number: 3:2019cv00021
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: John C Gargiulo
2 Judge: Halil S Ozerden
3 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 16 EXHIBIT re #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA . (Neilson, Philip)
March 25, 2019 Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA . (Neilson, Philip)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #6 Summons Returned Executed . (Neilson, Philip)
March 25, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re #7 Summons Returned Executed . (Neilson, Philip)
March 25, 2019 Filing 12 EXHIBIT re #5 Summons Returned Executed . (Neilson, Philip)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Robert J. Mims. (Benedict, Joseph)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. The deadline for Robert J. Mims to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is now 5/15/2019. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER WILL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo on 3/25/19. (hm) (no document attached) Modified on 3/26/2019 (jla).
March 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge John C. Gargiulo. Magistrate Judge Roy Percy no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Halil S. Ozerden for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson no longer assigned to case. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/21/19. (jtm)
March 19, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed, #7 Summons Returned Executed, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA; Please file front page of each Summons (jla)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Michael Alan Tarver All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Neilson, Philip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Michael Alan Tarver All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Neilson, Philip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Michael Alan Tarver Ricky Knight served on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Neilson, Philip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Michael Alan Tarver S. David Norquist served on 2/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Neilson, Philip)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Halbert Neilson on behalf of Michael Alan Tarver Robert J. Mims served on 2/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (Neilson, Philip)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Robert J. Mims, Ricky Knight, and S. David Norquist (jla)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 02/01/2019. (jwr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ricky Knight, Robert J. Mims, S. David Norquist. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1640706, filed by Michael Alan Tarver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)
February 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarver v. Mims et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Mims
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. David Norquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Alan Tarver
Represented By: Philip Halbert Neilson
Represented By: Christi Rena McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?