Parker v. Upright Installation, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Aramis Parker
Defendant: Orlando Davies and Upright Installation, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00037
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice Pursuant to #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Aramis Parker. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 4/9/2019. (lpm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher William Espy on behalf of Aramis Parker (Espy, Christopher)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Orlando Davies (jla)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Upright Installation, LLC (jla)
March 15, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher William Espy on behalf of Aramis Parker Orlando Davies served on 3/5/2019. (Espy, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Orlando Davies, Upright Installation, LLC. E-mailed to attorneys for service. (tab)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1647897, filed by Aramis Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Parker's Pay Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Upright Installation, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upright Installation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramis Parker
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?