Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al v. Enpro Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Yalobusha County, Mississippi and The Board of Trustees of Yalobusha General Hospital of Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Industries, Inc., Enpro Holdings Inc. and Samuel G. Williamson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00043
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation. (Sykes, Phillip)
April 26, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #25 Reply to Response to #10 Motion filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton) Modified on 4/29/2019 to link to corresponding motion(jwr).
April 26, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 18, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 Memorandum in Support, #17 MOTION to Strike References to Privileged Communications filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Liston, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 Response to #17 Motion filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton) Modified on 4/16/2019 to link to corresponding motion (jwr).
April 15, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 MOTION to Strike References to Privileged Communications filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
April 3, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference re #8 Initial Order - Rule 16.1; case stayed. (irw)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 4/1/19. (bfg)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO #10 MOTION TO DISMISS. (Liston, William) Modified on 4/2/2019 to link to corresponding motion (jwr).
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Material Profile Forms, #2 Exhibit 8-7-95 letter Townsend of Coltec, #3 Exhibit 9-5-95 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #4 Exhibit 1-29-2002 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #5 Exhibit 9-11-96 letter Plant Mgr to MDEQ, #6 Exhibit Stripper Tower TCE Levels, #7 Exhibit MDEQ Inspection Rpt 6-19-97, #8 Exhibit 4-23-96 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #9 Exhibit Analytical Analyses 12-22-95 to 7-24-96, #10 Exhibit DMRs 9-5-95 to 7-11-96, #11 Exhibit Williamson Regulatory Correspondence, #12 Exhibit Exerpt Purchase Agreement 5-31-96, #13 Exhibit Notice of Ownership Change, #14 Exhibit Excerpts Phase I Env Rpt 5-28-96, #15 Exhibit Excerpts Env Comp Audit 6-13-96, #16 Exhibit MDEQ Record of Tel Conv 9-26-95, #17 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #18 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III, #19 Exhibit TIWC Site Rem Rpt 5-20-96) (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #17 MOTION TO STRIKE REFERENCES TO PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Liston, William) Modified on 4/2/2019 to link to corresponding motion (jwr).
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Strike References to Privileged Communications by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #2 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III) (Liston, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF #15 MOTION TO REMAND filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Liston, William) Modified on 4/2/2019 to link to corresponding motion (jwr).
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Material Profile Forms, #2 Exhibit 8-7-95 letter Townsend of Coltec, #3 Exhibit 9-5-95 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #4 Exhibit 1-29-2002 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #5 Exhibit 9-11-96 letter Plant Mgr to MDEQ, #6 Exhibit Stripper Tower TCE Levels, #7 Exhibit MDEQ Inspection Rpt 6-19-97, #8 Exhibit 4-23-96 letter Williamson to MDEQ, #9 Exhibit Analytical Analyses 12-22-95 to 7-24-96, #10 Exhibit DMRs 9-5-95 to 7-11-96, #11 Exhibit Williamson Regulatory Correspondence, #12 Exhibit Exerpt Purchase Agreement 5-31-96, #13 Exhibit Notice of Ownership Change, #14 Exhibit Excerpts Phase I Env Rpt 5-28-96, #15 Exhibit Excerpts Env Comp Audit 6-13-96, #16 Exhibit MDEQ Record of Tel Conv 9-26-95, #17 Exhibit Aff of John Shannon Crow, #18 Exhibit Aff of Jay Gore III, #19 Exhibit TIWC Site Rem Rpt 5-20-96) (Liston, William)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/13/19. (bfg)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/11/2019. (jwr)
March 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Liston, William)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
March 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Samuel G. Williamson. (Byars, Wilton)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Amended Complaint (Unopposed) by Enpro Holdings Inc., Goodrich Corporation. (Sykes, Phillip)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/4/19. (irw)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lea Ann Smith on behalf of Enpro Holdings Inc., Enpro Industries, Inc., Goodrich Corporation (Smith, Lea)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Miles Forks on behalf of Samuel G. Williamson (Forks, Joseph)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, . (Byars, Wilton)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Enpro Industries, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi, The Board of Trustees of Yalobusha General Hospital of Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (jla)
March 1, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Yalobusha County, Mississippi, The Board of Trustees of Yalobusha General Hospital of Yalobusha County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint Part 2) (jla)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Enpro Holdings Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Industries, Inc. from Yalobusha County Circuit Court, case number CV-2019-8-JMY2. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1650411) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Enpro Holdings Inc., Goodrich Corporation, Enpro Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al v. Enpro Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enpro Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enpro Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Phillip Samuel Sykes
Represented By: Lea Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel G. Williamson
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Represented By: William Liston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of Trustees of Yalobusha General Hospital of Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Represented By: William Liston, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?