American Builders Insurance Company v. Poe Engineering, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Defendant: Brick Services Company, LLC, Brick Service Co, Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC, Aguila Construction, LLC, Lance Construction, LLC, Sergio Perez, John Does 1-10, Fernando Molina, Poe Engineering, Inc. and M Lance Construction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00051
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Filing 51 CORPORATE STATEMENT (of Aguila Construction, LLC). (Bagwell, Douglas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 50 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Fields, Cameron)
May 16, 2019 Filing 49 CORPORATE STATEMENT Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC. (Johnson, Bethany)
May 15, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bethany Brantley Johnson on behalf of Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC (Johnson, Bethany)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC answer due 5/28/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/15/19. (cs)
May 14, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hinton, Brian)
May 14, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas McIlwain Wright, Jr on behalf of Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC (Wright, Thomas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Austin Hinton on behalf of Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC (Hinton, Brian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 43 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Fernando Molina. (Crongeyer, James)
May 7, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Aguila Construction, LLC. (Bagwell, Douglas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Laura W. Givens on behalf of Sergio Perez (Givens, Laura)
May 6, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cameron Lacy Fields on behalf of M Lance Construction, LLC (Fields, Cameron)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Substitute Party. M Lance Construction, LLC added. Lance Construction, LLC terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/3/19. (cs)
May 3, 2019 Filing 38 Joint MOTION to Substitute Party by American Builders Insurance Company. (Holland, Drury)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Fernando Molina answer due 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 05/01/19. (cs)
April 30, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Fernando Molina. (Crongeyer, James)
April 30, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James Joseph Crongeyer, Jr on behalf of Fernando Molina (Crongeyer, James)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Aguila Construction, LLC's answer due 5/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/29/19. (cs)
April 29, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Aguila Construction, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - 4-26-19 email from Atty Dru Holland agreeing to extension) (Bagwell, Douglas)
April 29, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Brick Services Company, LLC (jla)
April 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Douglas Bagwell on behalf of Aguila Construction, LLC (Bagwell, Douglas)
April 25, 2019 Filing 30 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Fernando Molina (jla)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER finding as moot #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #28 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attorney Richard M. Carter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/23/19. (cs)
April 22, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order being submitted ; Attorney Richard M. Carter,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1667048) by Poe Engineering, Inc.. (Carter, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC and Aguila Construction, LLC (jla)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Samuel M. Fargotstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/16/19. (cs)
April 15, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Poe Engineering, Inc.. (Houston, Earl)
April 15, 2019 Filing 24 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure Statement of Poe Engineering, Inc.. (Houston, Earl)
April 15, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sergio Perez. (Thompson, Robert)
April 12, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order being Submitted to Judge ; Attorney Samuel M. Fargotstein,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1667058) by Poe Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Houston, Earl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Proposed Order being submitted ; Attorney Richard M. Carter,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1667048) by Poe Engineering, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Houston, Earl)
April 12, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Brick Services Company, LLC served on 4/8/2019. (Holland, Drury)
April 11, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lance Construction, LLC. (Carroll, Mark)
April 11, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE STATEMENT of American Builders Insurance Company. (Holland, Drury)
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Earl W. Houston, II on behalf of Poe Engineering, Inc. (Houston, Earl)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William David Darnell on behalf of Lance Construction, LLC (Darnell, William)
April 10, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Document to be refiled with signature of filing attorney included. (jtm)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William David Darnell on behalf of Lance Construction, LLC (Darnell, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tracy Aaron Overstreet on behalf of Lance Construction, LLC (Overstreet, Tracy)
April 9, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Fernando Molina served on 3/30/2019. (Holland, Drury)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/3/19. (rtc)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard M. Carter on behalf of Poe Engineering, Inc. (Carter, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC served on 3/25/2019. (Holland, Drury)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Poe Engineering, Inc. served on 3/25/2019. (Holland, Drury)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Lance Construction, LLC served on 3/25/2019. (Holland, Drury)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Aguila Construction, LLC served on 3/25/2019. (Holland, Drury)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Drury Sumner Holland on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company Sergio Perez served on 3/25/2019. (Holland, Drury)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Reissued as to Brick Services Company, LLC, Fernando Molina. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
March 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Timothy Ellzey on behalf of American Builders Insurance Company (Ellzey, Scott)
March 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer; DISREGARD - Entered in Error (jla)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Poe Engineering, Inc., Lance Construction, LLC, Fernando Molina, Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC, Aguila Construction, LLC, Brick Services Company, LLC, and Sergio Perez (jla)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Brick Services Company, LLC, Fernando Molina, Aguila Construction, LLC, Lance Construction, LLC, Sergio Perez, Poe Engineering, Inc., Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab) Modified on 3/18/2019 (tab).
March 13, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
March 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1655160, filed by American Builders Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Builders Insurance Company v. Poe Engineering, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brick Services Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brick Service Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockmasterz Drywall, LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIlwain Wright, Jr.
Represented By: Bethany Brantley Johnson
Represented By: Brian Austin Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aguila Construction, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Bagwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lance Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Carroll
Represented By: William David Darnell
Represented By: Tracy Aaron Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Perez
Represented By: Robert P. Thompson
Represented By: Laura W. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Molina
Represented By: James Joseph Crongeyer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poe Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Richard M. Carter
Represented By: Samuel M. Fargotstein
Represented By: Earl W. Houston, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Lance Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mark C. Carroll
Represented By: William David Darnell
Represented By: Cameron Lacy Fields
Represented By: Tracy Aaron Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Builders Insurance Company
Represented By: Drury Sumner Holland
Represented By: Scott Timothy Ellzey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?