Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Blackwell et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals, Austin Stull, FedEx Freight, Inc., UT Regional One Physicians, Inc., Desoto Family Medical Center, P.A., UT Medical Group, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc., Heather Jordan, Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., Hayley Hardy, Tyler Jordan, Stephen Blackwell, Shelby County Health Care Corporation and Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 58 EXHIBIT re #57 MOTION Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Tyler Jordan AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST TYLER JORDAN. (Buntin, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 57 MOTION Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Tyler Jordan by Stephen Blackwell. (Buntin, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 56 MOTION Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Hayley Hardy by Stephen Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Against Hayley Hardy) (Buntin, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Heather Jordan by Stephen Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Against Heather Jordan) (Buntin, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION Application for Entry of Default Against Defendant Austin Stull by Stephen Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Entry of Default Against Austin Stull) (Buntin, Taylor)
July 15, 2019 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Austin Stull (jla)
July 11, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Answer to Methodist's First Set of Interrogatories by Taylor Buntin on behalf of Stephen Blackwell, Stephen Blackwell to Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals. (Buntin, Taylor)
July 3, 2019 Filing 51 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Hayley Hardy (jla)
July 1, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Paul V. Cassisa, Jr on behalf of Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals to Safeco Insurance Company of America and Stephen Blackwell, Individually and as Parent and Natural Guardian of C.B.. (Cassisa, Paul)
June 27, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals' Disclosure in Response to Case Management Order by Paul V. Cassisa, Jr on behalf of Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals to All counsel of record. (Cassisa, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by Taylor Buntin on behalf of Stephen Blackwell, Stephen Blackwell Notice of Filing of Affidavit of Stephen Blackwell (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Stephen Blackwell) (Buntin, Taylor)
June 21, 2019 Filing 47 Restricted Document: Unredacted Complaint for Interpleader. (jtm)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #42 Motion to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/21/19. (cs)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 EXHIBIT re #44 Acknowledgment of Service (Hayley Hardy). (Rogers, Kevin)
June 20, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #44 Acknowledgment of Service; Attorney to refile using correct event and to include first page (jla)
June 18, 2019 Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #14 Summons Returned Executed (copy of Summons and Complaint mailed to Hayley Hardy 04-23-19) Acknowledgment filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by Paul V. Cassisa, Jr on behalf of Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals Notice of Filing of Affidavit (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tracie Wischoff) (Cassisa, Paul)
June 18, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION Renewed Motion to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/17/19. (rtc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 6/1/2020 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for October 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/14/19. (rtc)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 11/4/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/15/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/4/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/4/2019. Motions due by 12/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 10/8/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/14/19. (rtc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 6/14/2019. (rtc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Austin Stull (jla)
June 11, 2019 Filing 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Regional One Health a/k/a Shelby County Health Care Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Judy Briggs) (Rogers, Kevin)
June 11, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal - UT Regional One Physicians. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Randy Sites) (Rogers, Kevin)
June 10, 2019 DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 100,000, Receipt Number MSN300024224. (tab)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) Authorized deposit in the amount of $100,000.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/3/19. (cs)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2019 10:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (rtc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Baptist Memorial Hospital - DeSoto, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Duckett for BMH-DeSoto) (Rogers, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Austin Stull served on 5/15/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Heeney re Vengroff, FedEx, Cigna) (Rogers, Kevin)
May 8, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION of Dismissal - DeSoto Family Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Belisle for DeSoto) (Rogers, Kevin)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/7/19. (rtc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals. (Cassisa, Paul)
May 7, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Heather Jordan, Austin Stull, Tyler Jordan, Hayley Hardy, Vengroff Williams, Inc., FedEx Freight, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital-Desoto, Inc., Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals, Shelby County Health Care Corporation, and UT Regional One Physicians, Inc. (jla)
May 3, 2019 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal - UT Medical Group, Inc.. (Rogers, Kevin)
May 1, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , CROSSCLAIM against Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., Desoto Family Medical Center, P.A., FedEx Freight, Inc., Hayley Hardy, Heather Jordan, Tyler Jordan, Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals, Shelby County Health Care Corporation, Austin Stull, UT Medical Group, Inc., UT Regional One Physicians, Inc., Vengroff Williams, Inc. by Stephen Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SafeCo Insurance Policy) (Buntin, Taylor)
May 1, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taylor Buntin on behalf of Stephen Blackwell. (Buntin, Taylor) Modified on 5/1/2019 (jwr).
April 29, 2019 Filing 20 Response DEFENDANT UT MEDICAL GROUP, INC.S DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST. (Baskette, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America UT Regional One Physicians, Inc. served on 4/10/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America UT Medical Group, Inc. served on 4/10/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Tyler Jordan served on 4/6/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Shelby County Health Care Corporation served on 4/10/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Heather Jordan served on 4/6/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Hayley Hardy served on 4/7/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Desoto Family Medical Center, P.A. served on 4/8/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc. served on 4/22/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Reissued as to Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc. Returned to attorney for service. (jwr)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Stephen Blackwell waiver sent on 3/22/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Vengroff Williams, Inc. served on 4/3/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America FedEx Freight, Inc. served on 4/3/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc. served on 4/3/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc. served on 4/3/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals served on 4/3/2019. (Rogers, Kevin)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc., Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc., Desoto Family Medical Center, P.A., FedEx Freight, Inc., Hayley Hardy, Heather Jordan, Tyler Jordan, Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals, Shelby County Health Care Corporation, Austin Stull, UT Medical Group, Inc., UT Regional One Physicians, Inc., Vengroff Williams, Inc. Returned to attorney by U S mail in provided envelope. (tab) Modified on 5/7/2019 (jla).
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/20/19. (cs)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to File Unredacted Complaint Under Seal by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Rogers, Kevin)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1656376, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Insurance Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Blackwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Methodist Healthcare Memphis Hospitals
Represented By: Paul V. Cassisa, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Stull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FedEx Freight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Regional One Physicians, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Family Medical Center, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UT Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin O'Neal Baskette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Memorial Hospital-DeSoto, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayley Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Blackwell
Represented By: Taylor Buntin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelby County Health Care Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vengroff Williams, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Gregg A. Caraway
Represented By: Kevin A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?