Johnson v. New Season

Plaintiff: Natasha Johnson
Defendant: New Season and Desoto County Treatment Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 6/14/19 re #9 Notice of Settlement (rtc)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Craig Alan Cowart on behalf of New Season (Cowart, Craig)
May 31, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2019 11:30 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (rtc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Christopher William Espy on behalf of Natasha Johnson to Defendant, New Season. (Espy, Christopher)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Alan Cowart on behalf of New Season (Cowart, Craig)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT Defendant's Disclosure. (Barron, Sarah)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/7/19. (rtc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by New Season. (Barron, Sarah)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher William Espy on behalf of Natasha Johnson New Season served on 4/15/2019. (Espy, Christopher)
April 10, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to New Season. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1665811, filed by Natasha Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. New Season
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Season
Represented By: Sarah Foster (Sally) Barron
Represented By: Craig Alan Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto County Treatment Center
Represented By: Sarah Foster (Sally) Barron
Represented By: Craig Alan Cowart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natasha Johnson
Represented By: Christopher William Espy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?