Baker v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Julie H. Baker
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Julie H. Baker William Barr served on 5/29/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Julie H. Baker Social Security Administration Commissioner c/o General Counsel served on 5/28/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Upton Reynolds, II on behalf of Julie H. Baker William Lamar served on 5/28/2019. (Reynolds, Thomas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
May 20, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number MSN300024098 (tab)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Julie H. Baker. Objections to R&R due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 5/20/19. (jcm)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jwr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julie H. Baker. (jwr)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Julie H. Baker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie H. Baker
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?