Jay 2 Investments, LLC v. Great American Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jay 2 Investments, LLC
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company and Great American Insurance Company of New York
Case Number: 3:2019cv00113
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 7/17/19 as to #6 Amended Complaint, #7 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by Mississippi Insurance Department as to Great American Insurance Company of New York. (tab)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Great American Insurance Company of New York. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Great American Insurance Company of New York, Jury Demand, filed by Jay 2 Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Photos, #2 Exhibit "2" Report, #3 Exhibit "3" Recapitulation, #4 Exhibit "4" Letter, #5 Exhibit "5" Email, #6 Exhibit "6" Email, #7 Exhibit "7" Pollicy, #8 Summons Summons) (Bryan, John)
June 28, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Great American Insurance Company answer due 7/5/2019. (jla)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/21/19. (rtc)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/20/19. (bnd)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Plead, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Great American Insurance Company. (Blake, Paul)
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Great American Insurance Company. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1684046, filed by Jay 2 Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Photos, #2 Exhibit 2 Report of Findings, #3 Exhibit 3 Recapitulation, #4 Exhibit 4 Letter dated 2/21/2019, #5 Exhibit 5 E-mail dated 4/9/2019, #6 Exhibit 6 E-mail dated 1/14/2019, #7 Exhibit 7 Great American Insurance Policy, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay 2 Investments, LLC v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay 2 Investments, LLC
Represented By: John Chase Bryan
Represented By: Edwin Stephen Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Pacific Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?