Mathis v. Hall et al
Petitioner: James Mathis
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi and Pelicia Hall
Case Number: 3:2019cv00132
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order (jla)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #4 Order,, Set Deadlines,, Terminate Motions, Acknowledgment filed by Attorney General of the State of Mississippi, Pelicia Hall. (Owens, Jerrolyn)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING STATE TO RESPOND; Attorney General of the State of Mississippi answer due 9/24/2019; Pelicia Hall answer due 9/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 6/20/19. (cr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/21/2019) (cr).
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Mathis. (cr)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Lafayette) filed by James Mathis. (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mathis v. Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Mississippi
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pelicia Hall
Represented By: Jerrolyn M. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?