Norwood v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Ollie Marie Norwood
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 3:2019cv00137
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to US Marshal for service (jla)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/19. (cs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Reynolds, Thomas)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/27/19. (cs)
June 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ollie Marie Norwood. (tab)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by Ollie Marie Norwood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ollie Marie Norwood
Represented By: Thomas Upton Reynolds, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?