Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Valley Tool, Inc.
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Valley Tool, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00141
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/19. (rtc)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Dwayne Little on behalf of Valley Tool, Inc. (Little, Terry)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James David Harper on behalf of Valley Tool, Inc. (Harper, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Valley Tool, Inc. waiver sent on 7/11/2019. (Savage, Markeisha)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Valley Tools, Inc. (jla)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand,, filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Valley Tool, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Faye A. Williams
Represented By: Markeisha Katara Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Tool, Inc.
Represented By: Terry Dwayne Little
Represented By: James David Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?