Rogers v. The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Russell Rogers
Defendant: The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. and Torrey Mitchell
Case Number: 3:2019cv00142
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/26/19. (irw)
August 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erica Jo Lloyd on behalf of The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. (Lloyd, Erica)
August 23, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION Separate distinct notice of attorney appearance needed as to Erica J. Lloyd re #5 Notice of Attorney Appearance (tab)
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Landowners Protection Act) (Atkins, Jay)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C.. (Atkins, Jay)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jay Marshall Atkins on behalf of The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. (Atkins, Jay)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James D. Duckworth on behalf of Torrey Mitchell (Duckworth, James)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. and Torrey Mitchell (jla)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Glen H Davidson and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Torrey Mitchell, The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. Returned by USPS to attorney for service. (tab)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300024306, filed by Russell Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Tallahatchie Gourmet, L.L.C.
Represented By: Erica Jo Lloyd
Represented By: Jay Marshall Atkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrey Mitchell
Represented By: James D. Duckworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Rogers
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?