Sagely et al v. Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gordon Sagely and Rosanna Sagely
Defendant: Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. and Earl E. Patterson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/26/19. (irw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order du no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
August 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/14/2020 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 2 days) (spw)
August 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Russell Barton Jordan on behalf of Rosanna Sagely to Earl E. Patterson. (Jordan, Russell)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Request for Production by Russell Barton Jordan on behalf of Rosanna Sagely to Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.. (Jordan, Russell)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/14/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 3/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/20/19. (irw)
August 14, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 8/14/2019. (irw)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons Issued to Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., #3 Exhibit Summons Issued to Earl Patterson, #4 Exhibit Return Summons for Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., #5 Exhibit Return Summons for Earl Patterson) (Wyatt, Carl)
August 13, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; requested Attorney Wyatt file State Court Record (jla)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Russell Barton Jordan on behalf of Rosanna Sagely Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Jordan, Russell)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Discovery by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Earl E. Patterson to Plaintiffs. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Earl E. Patterson to Plaintiffs. (Wyatt, Carl) Modified on 8/1/2019 (jla).
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/12/19. (irw)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Earl E. Patterson. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.. (Wyatt, Carl)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Earl E. Patterson (Wyatt, Carl)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M Virden. (tab)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc., Earl E. Patterson, filed by Rosanna Sagely, Gordon Sagely. (tab)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. from Circuit Court of De Soto County, Mississippi, case number CI2019-291CWD. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1698362) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sagely et al v. Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Salmon & Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl E. Patterson
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Sagely
Represented By: Russell Barton Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanna Sagely
Represented By: Russell Barton Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?