Minor v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Plaintiff: Otis Minor
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Officer Bryan Sullivant, Attorney General Jim Hood, State of Mississippi, Town of Coldwater, John Doe II, John Doe 1, Jim Hood and State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00155
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Debra M Brown
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Town of Coldwater. (Pulliam, Jessica)
September 11, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Town of Coldwater. (Pulliam, Jessica)
September 11, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Incorrect document filed in error; attorney to refile correct document. (jwr)
September 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Town of Coldwater. (Pulliam, Jessica)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Officer Bryan Sullivant (jla)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for September 6, 2019 re #14 Order Staying Case (rtc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #11 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/19. (cs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 Municipal Defendant, Town of Coldwater's, ANSWER to State Court Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Town of Coldwater. (Pulliam, Jessica)
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Jim Hood, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi. (Barnes, Paul)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Jim Hood, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi. (Barnes, Paul)
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Jim Hood, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi. (Barnes, Paul)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #3 Summons State Summons - Mississippi Department of Public SafetyDPS, #4 Summons State Summons - Town of Coldwater, #5 Summons State Summons - Mississippi Attorney General Jim Hood, #6 Summons State Summons - Bryan Sullivant, #7 Summons Return of Summons - Town of Coldwater, #8 Notice of Notice of Removal, #9 Certification of Record by SState Clerk) (Barnes, Paul)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 7/25/19. (tab)
July 25, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Town of Coldwater answer due 8/15/2019. (cs)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/25/19. (cs)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court Defendant, Town of Coldwater's, Unopposed Motion forExtension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Town of Coldwater. (Pulliam, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jessica Terrill Pulliam on behalf of Town of Coldwater (Pulliam, Jessica)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/24/19. (rtc)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal. (tab)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Jim Hood, John Doe 1, John Doe II, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi, Bryan Sullivant, Town of Coldwater, filed by Otis Minor. (tab)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Jim Hood from Circuit Court of Tate County, Mississippi, case number 19-CV-117-JMT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1702145) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi, Mississippi Department of Public Safety, Jim Hood. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Town of Coldwater Joinder in Removal, #2 Exhibit B Summons and Complaint served on Removing Defendants, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minor v. Mississippi Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Minor
Represented By: Azki Shah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Paul Eldridge Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bryan Sullivant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Jim Hood
Represented By: Paul Eldridge Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Coldwater
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Jessica Terrill Pulliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Hood
Represented By: Paul Eldridge Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Mississippi, Ex Rel., Mississippi
Represented By: Paul Eldridge Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?