M. D. v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: M. D.
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00180
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/1/19. (bnd)
September 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending JPML Determination by Juul Labs, Inc.. (Kaufman, R.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F. Hall Bailey on behalf of M. D. Altria Group, Inc. served on 9/25/2019. (Bailey, F.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by F. Hall Bailey on behalf of M. D. Philip Morris USA, Inc. served on 9/25/2019. (Bailey, F.)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Juul Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., and Philip Morris USA, Inc. (jla)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Keith Morgan on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Morgan, Robert)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1709750, filed by M. D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M. D. v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juul Labs, Inc.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Morris USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. D.
Represented By: F. Hall Bailey
Represented By: Robert Keith Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?