Taylor v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary Taylor
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00194
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice due to settlement. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 10/21/2019. (lpm)
October 17, 2019 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Settlement Conference held on 10/17/2019. (rtc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures Submitted by Defendant Progressive Gulf Insurance Company by H. Richmond Culp, III on behalf of Progressive Gulf Insurance Company to Plaintiff. (Culp, H.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet for State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit Issued Summons for State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit Docket Page from State Court) (Culp, H.)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Culp, H.)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/30/19. (rtc)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Progressive Gulf Insurance Company, filed by Mary Taylor. (tab)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Panola County, Second Judicial District, case number CV2019-209-SM. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number MSN30001714533) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Progressive Gulf Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Taylor
Represented By: Mona Tedford Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Gulf Insurance Company
Represented By: H. Richmond Culp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?