Delek US Energy, Inc. v. American Petroleum Sales & Service
Plaintiff: Delek US Energy, Inc.
Defendant: American Petroleum Sales & Service
Case Number: 3:2019cv00200
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to American Petroleum Sales & Services (jla)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pope S. Mallette on behalf of Delek US Energy, Inc. American Petroleum Sales & Service served on 9/23/2019. (Mallette, Pope)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Mallette, Pope)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to American Petroleum Sales & Service. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1716332, filed by Delek US Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delek US Energy, Inc. v. American Petroleum Sales & Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Petroleum Sales & Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delek US Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?