Bryant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Dale Bryant
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00206
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Elizabeth L. Dudley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/15/19. (cs)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 EXHIBIT re #16 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Elizabeth L. Dudley,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1726590) Certificate of Good Standing. (Bossier, Sheila)
October 10, 2019 Filing 17 EXHIBIT re #16 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Elizabeth L. Dudley,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1726590) . (Bossier, Sheila)
October 7, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Elizabeth L. Dudley,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1726590) by Rodney Dale Bryant. (Bossier, Sheila)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sheila M. Bossier on behalf of Rodney Dale Bryant (Bossier, Sheila)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines until 11/30/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/27/19. (cs)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/20/19. (cs)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of All Defendants (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Elizabeth Dudley (jtm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Notice of Filing Submission, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Discovery Orders, #5 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #6 Daubert Orders, #7 Motions in Limine Orders, #8 Deposition Designation Orders, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-01894. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-01894-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15625653 filed by Rodney Dale Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Dale Bryant
Represented By: Elizabeth Dudley
Represented By: Sheila M. Bossier
Represented By: Elizabeth L. Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?