Seale et al v. Mississippi Department of Transportation et al
Plaintiff: Robin Seale and Lawrence "Jr" Seale
Defendant: Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., S&S Excavation, LLC, Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors and Mississippi Department of Transportation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00213
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/14/19. (bnd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time by S&S Excavation, LLC. (Horan, M.)
November 12, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by M. Kevin Horan on behalf of S&S Excavation, LLC (Horan, M.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Mississippi Department of Transportation. (Smith, Daniel)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John E. Milner on behalf of Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. (Milner, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors answer due 11/20/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/4/19. (bnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors. (Luciano, Arnulfo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Arnulfo Ursua Luciano on behalf of Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors (Luciano, Arnulfo)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel J. Griffith on behalf of Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors (Griffith, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. answer due 12/1/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/1/19. (bnd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (UNOPPOSED) by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Singley, Scott)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott Fuller Singley on behalf of Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. (Singley, Scott)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 11/13/2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/31/19. (bnd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/30/19. (rtc)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by S&S Excavation, LLC. (jwr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale (Rozier, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale (Rozier, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale (Rozier, David)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale (Rozier, David)
October 23, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 Summons Returned Executed, #5 Summons Returned Executed, #6 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed; Please refile to include first page of summons (jla)
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale S&S Excavation, LLC served on 10/14/2019. (Rozier, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale Mississippi Department of Transportation served on 10/16/2019. (Rozier, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors served on 10/16/2019. (Rozier, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. served on 10/16/2019. (Rozier, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Mississippi Department of Transportation, Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., S&S Excavation, LLC, and Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors (jla)
September 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Mississippi Department of Transportation, Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors, S&S Excavation, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1720700, filed by Robin Seale, Lawrence "Jr" Seale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seale et al v. Mississippi Department of Transportation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Fuller Singley
Represented By: John E. Milner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S Excavation, LLC
Represented By: M. Kevin Horan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pontotoc County Board of Supervisors
Represented By: Daniel J. Griffith
Represented By: Arnulfo Ursua Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Department of Transportation
Represented By: Daniel B. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Seale
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence "Jr" Seale
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?