Woods v. MHM Health Professionals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dr. Amy R. Woods
Defendant: Jesse Williams, Management & Training Corporation, Centurion of Mississippi, LLC, John Does 1-9 and MHM Health Professionals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00234
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss . (Waide, Jim)
December 20, 2019 Filing 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re #35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Amy R. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" (Offer of Employment, dated October 12, 2016), #2 Exhibit "B" (Letter to Dr. Woods from Jamaal Gilani, dated January 20, 2017), #3 Exhibit "C" (Letter to Dr. Woods from Kristie Huff, dated October 2, 2017), #4 Exhibit "D" (Judgment in Johnson, et al. v. Billings)) (Waide, Jim)
December 16, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Amy R. Woods. (Waide, Jim)
December 16, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Waide, Jim)
December 10, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss . (Hadley, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending the Court's Resolution of its Motion to Dismiss by MHM Health Professionals, LLC. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/10/19. (rtc)
December 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Amy R. Woods. (McLaughlin, Richard)
December 4, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER scheduling settlement conference for July 30, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/4/19. (rtc)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/29/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 9/4/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 1/3/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 6/4/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2020. Motions due by 9/25/2020. Settlement Conference set for 7/30/2020 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/4/19. (rtc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 28 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 12/4/2019. (rtc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Timothy Michael Peeples on behalf of Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams. (Peeples, Timothy)
December 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Amy R. Woods to Defendants. (McLaughlin, Richard)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/27/19. (cs)
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by MHM Health Professionals, LLC. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear as Counsel for MHM Health Professionals, LLC by MHM Health Professionals, LLC. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of MHM Health Professionals, LLC (Hadley, Elizabeth)
November 14, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; MHM Health Professionals, LLC waiver sent on 11/13/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint by Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams. (Peeples, Timothy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Does 1-9, Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams, MHM Health Professionals, LLC d/b/a Centurion Professionals, Jury Demand, filed by Amy R. Woods. (McLaughlin, Richard)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/12/19. (cs)
November 7, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Amy R. Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed First Amended Complaint)) (McLaughlin, Richard)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams. (Peeples, Timothy)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney David W. Long-Daniels. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/29/19. (cs)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney David W. Long-Daniels,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1732830), Notice of Correction, Certificate of Good Standing for State of Alabama. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jacob R. Dean. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/28/19. (cs)
October 28, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney David W. Long-Daniels,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1732830); requested Attorney file Certificate of Good Standing for State of Alabama (jla)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Centurion of Mississippi, LLC. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jacob R. Dean,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1732834) by Centurion of Mississippi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert Good Standing) (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney David W. Long-Daniels,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1732830) by Centurion of Mississippi, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Admitted Courts) (Hadley, Elizabeth)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/25/19. (rtc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Caroline C. Johnson on behalf of Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams (Johnson, Caroline)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued All Defendants, #4 Exhibit Summons Return on Management & Training Corporation, #5 Exhibit Summons Return on Centurion of Mississippi, LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons Return on Jesse Williams) (Peeples, Timothy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Amy R. Woods (Waide, Jim)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Pierce Waide on behalf of Amy R. Woods (Waide, Rachel)
October 25, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 JOINDER of Centurion of Mississippi, LLC, re #1 Notice of Removal (jla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams from Marshall County Circuit Court, case number CV2019-287. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1732235) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Management & Training Corporation, Jesse Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Teresa Aramaki, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Jesse Williams, #4 Exhibit D - Certified State Court File, #5 Exhibit E - Affidavit of Deana Johnson, #6 Exhibit F - Joinder and Consent of Centurion of Mississippi, LLC, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. MHM Health Professionals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Williams
Represented By: Timothy Michael Peeples
Represented By: Caroline C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Michael Peeples
Represented By: Caroline C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centurion of Mississippi, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Represented By: Jacob R. Dean
Represented By: David W. Long-Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-9
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MHM Health Professionals, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Ross Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Amy R. Woods
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Represented By: Rachel Pierce Waide
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?